Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce