Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 13 2025 7:30PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Elections: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Reported engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Reported engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Reported engrossed
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs