House | 05/12/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/30/2025 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 2461 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2461 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2265 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1574 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1574 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1406 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Local Government | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 116 | |
Senate | 11/22/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/22/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |