Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB467 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Paxton, Blanco S.B. No. 467
2- Zaffirini
1+By: Paxton, Zaffirini S.B. No. 467
2+ (In the Senate - Filed November 22, 2024; February 3, 2025,
3+ read first time and referred to Committee on Local Government;
4+ April 22, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
5+ Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 22, 2025,
6+ sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 467 By: West
39
410
511
612
713 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
814 AN ACT
915 relating to a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of the
1016 appraised value of an improvement to a residence homestead that is
1117 completely destroyed by a fire.
1218 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1319 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 11, Tax Code, is amended by
1420 adding Section 11.351 to read as follows:
1521 Sec. 11.351. TEMPORARY EXEMPTION FOR IMPROVEMENT TO
1622 RESIDENCE HOMESTEAD DESTROYED BY FIRE. (a) In this section,
1723 "residence homestead" has the meaning assigned by Section 11.13.
1824 (b) A person is entitled to an exemption from taxation by a
1925 taxing unit of the appraised value of an improvement to the person's
2026 residence homestead that is completely destroyed by a fire in an
2127 amount determined under Subsection (c). The person is entitled to
2228 the exemption only for the tax year in which the fire occurs.
2329 (c) The amount of the exemption authorized by this section
2430 for an improvement to a residence homestead completely destroyed by
2531 a fire in a tax year is calculated by multiplying the appraised
2632 value of the improvement for that tax year by a fraction, the
2733 denominator of which is 365 and the numerator of which is the number
2834 of days remaining in the tax year after the date on which the fire
2935 occurs.
3036 (d) A property owner must submit an application for an
3137 exemption authorized by this section to the chief appraiser of the
3238 appraisal district in which the improvement that is the subject of
3339 the application is located not later than the 180th day after the
3440 date the fire occurs.
3541 (e) On receipt of an application under Subsection (d), the
3642 chief appraiser shall determine whether the improvement that is the
3743 subject of the application was completely destroyed by a fire. In
3844 determining whether an improvement is completely destroyed by a
3945 fire, the chief appraiser may rely on information provided by any
4046 other source the chief appraiser considers appropriate, including a
4147 county fire marshal or an insurance adjuster.
4248 (f) If a person qualifies for the exemption authorized by
4349 this section after the amount of tax due on the property is
4450 calculated and the effect of the qualification is to reduce the
4551 amount of the tax due on the property, the assessor for each
4652 applicable taxing unit shall recalculate the amount of the tax due
4753 on the property and correct the tax roll. If the tax bill has been
4854 mailed and the tax on the property has not been paid, the assessor
4955 shall mail a corrected tax bill to the person in whose name the
5056 property is listed on the tax roll or to the person's authorized
5157 agent. If the tax on the property has been paid, the tax collector
5258 for the taxing unit shall refund to the person who paid the tax the
5359 amount by which the payment exceeded the tax due.
5460 (g) The comptroller, in consultation with appraisal
5561 districts, shall develop guidelines for determining whether an
5662 improvement is completely destroyed by a fire.
5763 SECTION 2. Not later than September 1, 2026, the
5864 comptroller shall develop the guidelines required by Section
5965 11.351, Tax Code, as added by this Act, and shall distribute those
6066 guidelines to each appraisal district.
6167 SECTION 3. The change in law made by this Act applies only
6268 to an ad valorem tax year that begins on or after the effective date
6369 of this Act.
6470 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2026, but only
6571 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 89th Legislature,
6672 Regular Session, 2025, to authorize the legislature to provide for
6773 a temporary exemption from ad valorem taxation of the appraised
6874 value of an improvement to a residence homestead that is completely
6975 destroyed by a fire is approved by the voters. If that amendment is
7076 not approved by the voters, this Act has no effect.
77+ * * * * *