Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB467 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2024
Analysis November 22, 2024
Fiscal Note November 22, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 23, 2025
Analysis April 23, 2025
Fiscal Note April 23, 2025
Bill April 23, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 22, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 22, 2025
Analysis April 11, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 20, 2025
Fiscal Note April 12, 2025