House | 04/28/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 1587 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | ||
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1373 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 542 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 413 | |
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/27/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 120 | |
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/25/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |