Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 25, 2024
Analysis November 25, 2024
Fiscal Note November 25, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 13, 2025
Witness List March 13, 2025
Analysis March 13, 2025
Fiscal Note March 13, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 13, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 12, 2025
Fiscal Note February 24, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 11, 2025
Analysis February 24, 2025