E
|
05/07/2025
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1863
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Signed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
Senate
|
05/06/2025
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1788
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2923
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1475
|
Journal Page: 2922
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Record vote RV#1475
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2922
|
House
|
05/06/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2922
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2771
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#1376
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Record vote RV#1376
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/05/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 589
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/01/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1086
|
House
|
03/25/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 767
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 670
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 668
|
Senate
|
03/24/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 687
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 638
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
02/03/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 130
|
Senate
|
12/13/2024
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2024
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|