Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB610 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 16, 2024
Analysis December 16, 2024
Fiscal Note December 16, 2024

House Committee Report

Analysis April 30, 2025
Bill April 30, 2025

Engrossed

Bill March 24, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 19, 2025
Bill March 19, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 30, 2025
Analysis March 7, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 30, 2025
Bill March 19, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 10, 2025