Senate | 03/13/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/12/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 503 | |
Senate | 03/11/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/05/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 414 | |
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/03/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/24/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 77 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 77 | |
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |