Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB62 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note November 25, 2024
Analysis November 25, 2024
Bill November 12, 2024

Senate Committee Report

Bill March 5, 2025
Fiscal Note March 5, 2025
Analysis March 5, 2025
Witness List March 5, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 5, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 4, 2025
Fiscal Note February 21, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 4, 2025
Analysis February 13, 2025