Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB62 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 03/05/2025

                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 62
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2024; February 3, 2025,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 5, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 1; March 5, 2025,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 62 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the reading and marking of a ballot by a person
 occupying a voting station or by the person's child.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 64.002(b), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A child under 18 years of age may accompany the child's
 parent to a voting station, and, if the child is under 14 years of
 age, the child may read or mark the ballot at the direction of the
 parent. Reading or marking a ballot under this subsection does not
 constitute assisting a voter for purposes of Subchapter B.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2025.
 * * * * *