House | 05/07/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/06/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/05/2025 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2805 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2640 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1678 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Co-author authorized | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/28/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1551 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1367 | |
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 02/03/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 133 | |
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Filed | ||
Senate | 12/18/2024 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |