Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB646 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note December 18, 2024
Analysis December 18, 2024
Bill December 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 30, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 16, 2025
Witness List April 16, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 16, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 10, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 9, 2025