Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
Read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2025
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2025
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1612
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#944
|
Journal Page: 2278
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Record vote RV#944
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2159
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote
|
RV#825
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Record vote RV#825
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended
|
1-M. Gonzlez
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Amended 1-M. González
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2025
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 271
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2025
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2025
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2025
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1635
|
House
|
04/22/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1635
|
House
|
04/17/2025
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1357
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2025
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2025
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2025
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2025
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Referred to Education K-16
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2025
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2025
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|