LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2025 - 89th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB769
Compare Versions
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB769
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2025 - 89th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB769
Compare Versions
SB769 Comm Sub April 28, 2025
SB769 House Committee Report April 28, 2025
SB769 Engrossed April 17, 2025
SB769 Engrossed April 16, 2025
SB769 Senate Committee Report April 10, 2025
SB769 Comm Sub April 10, 2025
SB769 Introduced January 13, 2025
Version 1 (Old)
SB769 Comm Sub April 28, 2025
SB769 House Committee Report April 28, 2025
SB769 Engrossed April 17, 2025
SB769 Engrossed April 16, 2025
SB769 Senate Committee Report April 10, 2025
SB769 Comm Sub April 10, 2025
SB769 Introduced January 13, 2025
Version 2 (New)
Compare