Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB769 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2025
Analysis January 13, 2025
Fiscal Note January 13, 2025

House Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2025
Analysis April 28, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 17, 2025
Bill April 16, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Analysis April 10, 2025
Bill April 10, 2025
Fiscal Note April 10, 2025
Witness List April 10, 2025

Senate Amendments Printing

Fiscal Note April 30, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 30, 2025
Fiscal Note April 8, 2025
Fiscal Note April 1, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill April 10, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 25, 2025
Analysis April 9, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025