House | 05/02/2025 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/02/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2751 | |
House | 05/01/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2640 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1686 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1660 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1660 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1660 | |
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1683 | |
Senate | 04/29/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1505 | |
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/23/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Referred to Education K-16 | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 02/07/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 213 | |
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/15/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |