Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB800 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2025
Fiscal Note January 16, 2025
Analysis January 16, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2025
Fiscal Note April 25, 2025
Analysis April 25, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 24, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 24, 2025
Fiscal Note April 15, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2025
Analysis April 14, 2025