Senate | 04/30/2025 | Reported enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/30/2025 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1612 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Record vote | RV#945 | Journal Page: 2277 |
House | 04/30/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 04/30/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2277 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Record vote | RV#830 | Journal Page: 2163 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2163 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2158 | |
House | 04/29/2025 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1819 | Journal Page: 2158 |
House | 04/29/2025 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2025 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2267 | |
House | 04/24/2025 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2025 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 04/17/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1575 | |
House | 04/14/2025 | Received from the Senate | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1096 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Passed | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Three day rule suspended | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Vote recorded in Journal | ||
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1084 | |
Senate | 04/10/2025 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1031 | |
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/01/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Vet Affairs | Journal Page: 250 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 250 | |
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/24/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |