Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB897 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2025
Analysis January 24, 2025
Fiscal Note January 24, 2025

House Committee Report

Analysis April 28, 2025
Bill April 28, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 10, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List April 3, 2025
Analysis April 3, 2025
Fiscal Note April 3, 2025
Bill April 3, 2025

Enrolled

Bill April 30, 2025

Analysis

Analysis April 28, 2025
Analysis April 1, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill April 28, 2025
Bill April 2, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 1, 2025
Fiscal Note March 17, 2025