BILL ANALYSIS Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 897 89R19096 MPF-D By: Blanco Veteran Affairs 4/1/2025 Committee Report (Substituted) AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT Certain grant programs that fund community mental health services for veterans and their families, including the Texas Veterans + Family Alliance Grant Program (TV+FA), require a funding match from non-state sources to receive state funds. Under current law, the required match varies by county population: 25 percent for counties with fewer than 100,000 residents, 50 percent for counties with populations between 100,000 and 249,999, and 100 percent for counties with 250,000 or more residents. These match requirements place a significant financial burden on qualifying organizations and local entities that support veterans, jeopardizing the sustainability of critical mental health services. S.B. 897 ensures continued access to care for veterans and their families by reducing the grant match requirement from 100 percent to 50 percent for mental health programs serving veterans and their families in counties with over 250,000 residents. Analysis S.B. 897 amends Sections 547.0304 and 547.0305 of the Government Code to lower the grant match requirement for mental health programs serving veterans and their families from 100 percent to 50 percent for counties with over 250,000 residents. Legislative History 88R HB 4923 passed the House and was referred to the Senate Veteran Affairs committee on May 11, 2023. Committee Substitute C.S.S.B. 897 instead lowers the grant match requirement for counties with over 250,000 residents from 100 percent to 75 percent. C.S.S.B. 897 amends current law relating to the administration of a grant program to support community mental health programs assisting veterans and their families. RULEMAKING AUTHORITY This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency. SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS SECTION 1. Amends Sections 547.0304 and 547.0305, Government Code, as effective April 1, 2025, as follows: Sec. 547.0304. MATCHING GRANT CONDITIONS: SINGLE COUNTIES. Requires the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), for services and treatment provided in a single county, to condition each grant provided under Subchapter G (Matching Grant Program For Community Mental Health Programs Assisting Veterans and Their Families), Chapter 547 (Mental Health and Substance Use Services), on a potential grant recipient providing funds from non-state sources in certain total amounts, including 75 percent, rather than 100 percent, of the grant amount if the community mental health program to be supported by the grant provides services and treatment in a county with a population of 250,000 or more. Sec. 547.0305. MATCHING GRANT CONDITIONS: MULTIPLE COUNTIES. Requires HHSC, for a community mental health program that provides services and treatment in more than one county, to condition each grant provided under this subchapter on a potential grant recipient providing funds from non-state sources in certain total amounts, including 75 percent, rather than 100 percent, of the grant amount if the community mental health program to be supported by the grant provides services and treatment in a county with a population of 250,000 or more. SECTION 2. Makes application of this Act prospective. SECTION 3. Provides that HHSC is required to implement the changes in law made by this Act to Sections 547.0304 and 547.0305, Government Code, only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose in an amount greater than the amount appropriated to HHSC for that purpose for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2025. Authorizes, but does not require, HHSC, if the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that purpose and in such amount, to implement those changes in law using other money available to HHSC for that purpose. SECTION 4. Effective date: September 1, 2025. BILL ANALYSIS Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 897 89R19096 MPF-D By: Blanco Veteran Affairs 4/1/2025 Committee Report (Substituted) Senate Research Center C.S.S.B. 897 89R19096 MPF-D By: Blanco Veteran Affairs 4/1/2025 Committee Report (Substituted) AUTHOR'S / SPONSOR'S STATEMENT OF INTENT Certain grant programs that fund community mental health services for veterans and their families, including the Texas Veterans + Family Alliance Grant Program (TV+FA), require a funding match from non-state sources to receive state funds. Under current law, the required match varies by county population: 25 percent for counties with fewer than 100,000 residents, 50 percent for counties with populations between 100,000 and 249,999, and 100 percent for counties with 250,000 or more residents. These match requirements place a significant financial burden on qualifying organizations and local entities that support veterans, jeopardizing the sustainability of critical mental health services. S.B. 897 ensures continued access to care for veterans and their families by reducing the grant match requirement from 100 percent to 50 percent for mental health programs serving veterans and their families in counties with over 250,000 residents. Analysis S.B. 897 amends Sections 547.0304 and 547.0305 of the Government Code to lower the grant match requirement for mental health programs serving veterans and their families from 100 percent to 50 percent for counties with over 250,000 residents. Legislative History 88R HB 4923 passed the House and was referred to the Senate Veteran Affairs committee on May 11, 2023. Committee Substitute C.S.S.B. 897 instead lowers the grant match requirement for counties with over 250,000 residents from 100 percent to 75 percent. C.S.S.B. 897 amends current law relating to the administration of a grant program to support community mental health programs assisting veterans and their families. RULEMAKING AUTHORITY This bill does not expressly grant any additional rulemaking authority to a state officer, institution, or agency. SECTION BY SECTION ANALYSIS SECTION 1. Amends Sections 547.0304 and 547.0305, Government Code, as effective April 1, 2025, as follows: Sec. 547.0304. MATCHING GRANT CONDITIONS: SINGLE COUNTIES. Requires the Health and Human Services Commission (HHSC), for services and treatment provided in a single county, to condition each grant provided under Subchapter G (Matching Grant Program For Community Mental Health Programs Assisting Veterans and Their Families), Chapter 547 (Mental Health and Substance Use Services), on a potential grant recipient providing funds from non-state sources in certain total amounts, including 75 percent, rather than 100 percent, of the grant amount if the community mental health program to be supported by the grant provides services and treatment in a county with a population of 250,000 or more. Sec. 547.0305. MATCHING GRANT CONDITIONS: MULTIPLE COUNTIES. Requires HHSC, for a community mental health program that provides services and treatment in more than one county, to condition each grant provided under this subchapter on a potential grant recipient providing funds from non-state sources in certain total amounts, including 75 percent, rather than 100 percent, of the grant amount if the community mental health program to be supported by the grant provides services and treatment in a county with a population of 250,000 or more. SECTION 2. Makes application of this Act prospective. SECTION 3. Provides that HHSC is required to implement the changes in law made by this Act to Sections 547.0304 and 547.0305, Government Code, only if the legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose in an amount greater than the amount appropriated to HHSC for that purpose for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2025. Authorizes, but does not require, HHSC, if the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that purpose and in such amount, to implement those changes in law using other money available to HHSC for that purpose. SECTION 4. Effective date: September 1, 2025.