House | 05/07/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/22/2025 | Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1640 | |
House | 04/22/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1648 | |
Senate | 04/22/2025 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2025 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1567 | |
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Reported engrossed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Passed | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 3rd time | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Record vote | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | ||
Senate | 04/16/2025 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | ||
Senate | 04/14/2025 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2025 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 936 | |
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 808 | |
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 423 | |
Senate | 03/06/2025 | Rereferred to committee | Journal Page: 423 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 02/13/2025 | Read first time | Journal Page: 256 | |
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/29/2025 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |