Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB964 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 29, 2025
Analysis January 29, 2025
Fiscal Note January 29, 2025

Engrossed

Bill April 16, 2025

Senate Committee Report

Witness List March 31, 2025
Analysis March 31, 2025
Fiscal Note March 31, 2025
Bill March 31, 2025

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2025

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 28, 2025
Fiscal Note March 18, 2025

Analysis

Analysis March 28, 2025
Analysis March 17, 2025