1 | | - | By: Hughes, Flores S.B. No. 964 |
---|
2 | | - | |
---|
3 | | - | |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Hughes S.B. No. 964 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2025; February 13, 2025, |
---|
| 3 | + | read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; |
---|
| 4 | + | March 6, 2025, rereferred to Committee on State Affairs; |
---|
| 5 | + | March 31, 2025, reported adversely, with favorable Committee |
---|
| 6 | + | Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 31, 2025, |
---|
| 7 | + | sent to printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 964 By: Paxton |
---|
4 | 10 | | |
---|
5 | 11 | | |
---|
6 | 12 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
7 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
8 | 14 | | relating to the appearance of a personal identification certificate |
---|
9 | 15 | | or driver's license issued to a person who is not a citizen of the |
---|
10 | 16 | | United States. |
---|
11 | 17 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 18 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 521, Transportation Code, |
---|
13 | 19 | | is amended by adding Section 521.1017 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 20 | | Sec. 521.1017. DESIGNATOR ON CERTIFICATE ISSUED TO |
---|
15 | 21 | | NONCITIZEN. A personal identification certificate issued to a |
---|
16 | 22 | | person who is not a citizen of the United States must: |
---|
17 | 23 | | (1) orient the information on the certificate to |
---|
18 | 24 | | clearly distinguish the certificate from a personal identification |
---|
19 | 25 | | certificate issued to a person who is a citizen; and |
---|
20 | 26 | | (2) display the phrase "NOT ELIGIBLE TO VOTE" on the |
---|
21 | 27 | | front of the certificate in the same font size as the individual's |
---|
22 | 28 | | personal identification certificate number. |
---|
23 | 29 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter F, Chapter 521, Transportation Code, |
---|
24 | 30 | | is amended by adding Section 521.1231 to read as follows: |
---|
25 | 31 | | Sec. 521.1231. DESIGNATOR ON LICENSE ISSUED TO NONCITIZEN. |
---|
26 | 32 | | A driver's license issued to an applicant who is not a citizen of |
---|
27 | 33 | | the United States must: |
---|
28 | 34 | | (1) orient the information on the license vertically, |
---|
29 | 35 | | regardless of the age of the applicant, to clearly distinguish the |
---|
30 | 36 | | license from a driver's license issued to a person who is a citizen; |
---|
31 | 37 | | and |
---|
32 | 38 | | (2) display the phrase "NOT ELIGIBLE TO VOTE" on the |
---|
33 | 39 | | front of the license in the same font size as the individual's |
---|
34 | 40 | | driver's license number. |
---|
35 | 41 | | SECTION 3. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
36 | 42 | | a personal identification certificate or driver's license issued or |
---|
37 | 43 | | renewed on or after the effective date of this Act. A personal |
---|
38 | 44 | | identification certificate or driver's license issued or renewed |
---|
39 | 45 | | before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in |
---|
40 | 46 | | effect when the license or certificate was issued or renewed, and |
---|
41 | 47 | | the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. |
---|
42 | 48 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2025. |
---|