Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR111 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
02/19/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Mar 25 2025 3:26PM
SB9
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Mar 26 2025 11:31AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/26/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Mar 26 2025 11:31AM
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 02/24/2025 S Printed in full
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 02/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)