Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR238 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/18/2025
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/07/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 14 2025 9:14PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/07/2025 E Sent to the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Reported enrolled
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2025 E Sent to the Governor