Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR276 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/19/2025
SB3
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
SB6
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Mar 25 2025 3:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/19/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM