Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR311 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
03/27/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 03/27/2025 S Printed in full
Introduced
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker: May 1 2025 5:10PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM