Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Environmental Regulation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to s/c on International Relations by Speaker: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM