Senate
|
06/15/2023
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 249 - 181 (Roll no. 268).
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
The House adopted the amendment as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1640.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
H.Amdt.189 On agreeing to the Pallone amendment (A003) Failed by recorded vote: 209 - 225 (Roll no. 267).
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
H.Amdt.188 On agreeing to the McGovern amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 207 - 224 (Roll no. 266).
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
The House resolved into Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union for further consideration.
|
|
|
House
|
06/14/2023
|
Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2922-2924)
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union rises leaving H.R. 1640 as unfinished business.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
On motion that the committee rise Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Mrs. Lesko moved that the committee rise.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the Pallone amendment No. 3, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. Pallone demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 495, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Pallone amendment No. 3.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
H.Amdt.189 Amendment (A003) offered by Mr. Pallone. (consideration: CR H2864-2865; text: CR H2864)
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on the McGovern amendment No. 2, the Chair put the question on adoption of the amendment and by voice vote, announced that the noes had prevailed. Mr. McGovern demanded a recorded vote and the Chair postponed further proceedings until a time to be announced.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 495, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McGovern amendment No. 2.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
H.Amdt.188 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. McGovern. (consideration: CR H2863-2864; text: CR H2863)
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
H.Amdt.187 On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 495, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huizenga amendment No. 1.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
H.Amdt.187 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Huizenga. (consideration: CR H2862-2863; text: CR H2862)
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1640.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 495 and Rule XVIII.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
The Speaker designated the Honorable Austin Scott to act as Chairman of the Committee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 44, H.R. 277, H.R. 288, H.R. 1615 and H.R. 1640. The resolution provides for consideration of H. J. Res. 44 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and H.R. 277, H.R. 288, H.R. 1615, and H.R. 1640 under structured rules with one hour of general debate. Motion to recommit allowed on each measure. The resolution also provides that the ordering of the yeas and nays on the question of reconsideration of the vote on adoption of H. Res. 463 be considered vacated and the motion to reconsider be laid on the table.
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 495. (consideration: CR H2856-2865; text: CR H2862)
|
|
|
House
|
06/13/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 495 passed House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/12/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 495 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.J. Res. 44, H.R. 277, H.R. 288, H.R. 1615 and H.R. 1640. The resolution provides for consideration of H. J. Res. 44 under a closed rule with one hour of general debate and H.R. 277, H.R. 288, H.R. 1615, and H.R. 1640 under structured rules with one hour of general debate. Motion to recommit allowed on each measure. The resolution also provides that the ordering of the yeas and nays on the question of reconsideration of the vote on adoption of H. Res. 463 be considered vacated and the motion to reconsider be laid on the table.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2023
|
Rule H. Res. 463 failed passage of House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2023
|
Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 463 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 277, H.R. 288, H.R. 1615 and H.R. 1640. The resolution provides for consideration of H. R. 277 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate; H. R. 288 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate; H. R. 1615 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate; and H. R. 1640 under a structured rule with one hour of general debate. One motion to recommit on each measure.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 63.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2023
|
Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 118-86.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 31 - 18.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 10 .
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy, Climate and Grid Security.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|