|
12/16/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 704.
|
Action Code: , Type: Calendars
|
|
Senate
|
09/18/2024
|
Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H2854)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 272.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2853-2854)
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Mr. LaTurner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2024
|
Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 118-483, Part I.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 42 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2024
|
Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 35 - 0.
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Accountability, and in addition to the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2023
|
Introduced in House
|
|
|