Executive
|
12/23/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Became Public Law No: 118-188.
|
Action Code: E40000, Type: President
|
|
|
12/16/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
|
Action Code: H38310, Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/13/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Message on Senate action sent to the House.
|
Action Code: , Type: Floor
|
|
|
12/12/2024
{ { date("g:i a", strtotime($action['date'])) }}
|
Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S7010-7011)
|
Action Code: , Type: Floor
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2024
|
Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 651.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2024
|
Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Peters with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 118-250.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/31/2024
|
Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|