Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HB0411 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 22, 2023
Fiscal Note February 20, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023
Fiscal Note February 9, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 16, 2023