House | 03/03/2023 | House/ filed in House file for bills not passed | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | House/ strike enacting clause in Clerk of the House | ||
House | 03/01/2023 | House/ comm rpt/ sent to Rules/ substituted in House Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | House Comm - Returned to Rules in House Business and Labor Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House Comm - Motion to Recommend Failed in House Business and Labor Committee | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | House Comm - Substitute Recommendation from # 0 to # 1 in House Business and Labor Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House/ to standing committee in House Business and Labor Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | House/ to Printing with fiscal note in House Business and Labor Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | House/ received fiscal note from Fiscal Analyst in House Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House/ 1st reading (Introduced) in House Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/13/2023 | House/ received bill from Legislative Research in Clerk of the House | ||
02/10/2023 | Numbered Bill Publicly Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel | |||
02/10/2023 | Bill Numbered but not Distributed in Legislative Research and General Counsel |