LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Utah UT
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB0445
Draft Versions
UT
Utah House Bill HB0445
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Utah 2023 Regular Session
Utah House Bill HB0445
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 21, 2023
Compare
Fiscal Note
February 16, 2023
Fiscal Note
February 15, 2023
Bill
February 10, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
February 14, 2023