Utah 2023 Regular Session

Utah House Bill HR0002 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 18, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023
Fiscal Note February 12, 2023
Bill February 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Analysis February 17, 2023