Senate | 03/19/2025 | Read 1st time & referred to Committee on Institutions | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Read third time and passed | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Action Calendar: Third Reading | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Third Reading ordered | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Rep. Campbell of St. Johnsbury spoke for the Committee on Energy and Digital Infrastructure | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Read second time | ||
House | 03/13/2025 | Action Calendar: Committee bill for second reading | ||
House | 03/12/2025 | Notice Calendar: Committee bill for second reading | ||
House | 03/11/2025 | Committee bill read the first time and placed on Notice Calendar on 3/12/2025 |