House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Laid on the table | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 02/08/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/07/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Energy and Utilities, Ayes 16, Noes 0 | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 05/30/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a coauthor | ||
House | 05/16/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Representative Joers added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Representative Ohnstad added as a coauthor | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Senator Spreitzer added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Representative Bodden added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/10/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Energy and Utilities | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Introduced |