House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Assembly Substitute Amendment 1 offered by Representative Sortwell | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | LRB correction | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Jobs, Economy and Small Business Development | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Introduced |