Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Financial Institutions and Sporting Heritage | ||
Senate | 01/25/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read a third time and passed | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Rules suspended | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
House | 01/25/2024 | Read a second time | ||
House | 01/23/2024 | Made a special order of business at 10:13 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23 | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 01/04/2024 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Sporting Heritage, Ayes 10, Noes 0 | ||
House | 12/05/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
House | 11/15/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 11/07/2023 | Representative Jacobson added as a coauthor | ||
House | 09/21/2023 | Representative Shankland added as a coauthor | ||
House | 07/18/2023 | Representative Madison added as a coauthor | ||
House | 06/06/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Sporting Heritage | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Introduced |