House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to pass pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 08/22/2023 | Assembly Amendment 2 offered by Representative Steffen | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
House | 05/22/2023 | Assembly Amendment 1 offered by Representative Steffen | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Introduced |