Senate | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Placed on calendar 3-12-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Representative Subeck added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Received from Assembly | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 02/15/2024 | Adopted | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Representatives Schraa, VanderMeer, Joers and C. Anderson added as coauthors | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-15-2024 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Senator Wanggaard added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/12/2024 | Introduced |