Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR115 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/12/2024

                            LRB-5836/1
CMH:klm
2023 - 2024  LEGISLATURE  
2023 ASSEMBLY JOINT RESOLUTIO N 115
February 12, 2024 - Introduced by Representatives GUNDRUM, ARMSTRONG, BARE,
BEHNKE, BINSFELD, CALLAHAN, DITTRICH, DONOVAN, DRAKE, DUCHOW, EDMING,
GUSTAFSON, JACOBSON, KRUG, MAGNAFICI, MAXEY, MOORE OMOKUNDE, NOVAK,
O'CONNOR, OHNSTAD, ORTIZ-VELEZ, PETRYK, RATCLIFF, RETTINGER, ROZAR, TITTL,
SCHMIDT, SHANKLAND, SINICKI, SORTWELL, SPIROS, TUSLER and WITTKE,
cosponsored by Senators TESTIN, BALLWEG, CARPENTER, COWLES, MARKLEIN,
NASS, SPREITZER and WIRCH. Referred to Committee on Rules.
***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
Relating to: commemorating the 80th anniversary of D-Day.
Whereas, on September 1, 1939, Germany declared war on Poland and started
the Second World War; and
Whereas, France surrendered on June 25, 1940, and was occupied by the Axis
countries of Germany and Italy; and
Whereas, the United States entered the war following the Japanese attack at
Pearl Harbor on December 7, 1941; and
Whereas, at the Trident Conference in May 1943, American President Franklin
D. Roosevelt and British Prime Minister Winston Churchill decided an Allied
invasion of German-occupied France would take place in 1944; and
Whereas, more than 150,000 soldiers and 190,000 naval personnel participated
in airborne operations and the amphibious landings at beaches along the Normandy
coastline code-named Omaha, Utah, Gold, Juno, and Sword; and
Whereas, American, British, Canadian, Free French, and Free Polish divisions
participated in the invasion, which commenced June 6, 1944; and
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13
14
15 - 2 -
LRB-5836/1
CMH:klm
2023 - 2024  Legislature
Whereas, Allied forces received additional support from the French Resistance;
and
Whereas, more than 9,000 Allied troops were killed or wounded during the first
24 hours of the invasion; and
Whereas, the Normandy landings were the beginning of the liberation of
Western Europe from Axis control; and
Whereas, the French capital of Paris was liberated from German control on
August 25, 1944; now, therefore, be it
Resolved by the assembly, the senate concurring, That the members of the
Wisconsin Legislature solemnly recognize June 6, 2024, as the 80th anniversary of
the D-Day invasion and pay tribute to the millions of American and other Allied
troops who served honorably during the Second World War.
(END)
1
2
3
4
5
6
7
8
9
10
11
12
13