Wisconsin 2023-2024 Regular Session

Wisconsin Assembly Bill AJR115 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 LRB-5836/1
22 CMH:klm
33 2023 - 2024 LEGISLATURE
44 2023 ASSEMBLY JOINT RESOLUTIO N 115
55 February 12, 2024 - Introduced by Representatives GUNDRUM, ARMSTRONG, BARE,
66 BEHNKE, BINSFELD, CALLAHAN, DITTRICH, DONOVAN, DRAKE, DUCHOW, EDMING,
77 GUSTAFSON, JACOBSON, KRUG, MAGNAFICI, MAXEY, MOORE OMOKUNDE, NOVAK,
88 O'CONNOR, OHNSTAD, ORTIZ-VELEZ, PETRYK, RATCLIFF, RETTINGER, ROZAR, TITTL,
99 SCHMIDT, SHANKLAND, SINICKI, SORTWELL, SPIROS, TUSLER and WITTKE,
1010 cosponsored by Senators TESTIN, BALLWEG, CARPENTER, COWLES, MARKLEIN,
1111 NASS, SPREITZER and WIRCH. Referred to Committee on Rules.
1212 ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE***
1313 Relating to: commemorating the 80th anniversary of D-Day.
1414 Whereas, on September 1, 1939, Germany declared war on Poland and started
1515 the Second World War; and
1616 Whereas, France surrendered on June 25, 1940, and was occupied by the Axis
1717 countries of Germany and Italy; and
1818 Whereas, the United States entered the war following the Japanese attack at
1919 Pearl Harbor on December 7, 1941; and
2020 Whereas, at the Trident Conference in May 1943, American President Franklin
2121 D. Roosevelt and British Prime Minister Winston Churchill decided an Allied
2222 invasion of German-occupied France would take place in 1944; and
2323 Whereas, more than 150,000 soldiers and 190,000 naval personnel participated
2424 in airborne operations and the amphibious landings at beaches along the Normandy
2525 coastline code-named Omaha, Utah, Gold, Juno, and Sword; and
2626 Whereas, American, British, Canadian, Free French, and Free Polish divisions
2727 participated in the invasion, which commenced June 6, 1944; and
2828 1
2929 2
3030 3
3131 4
3232 5
3333 6
3434 7
3535 8
3636 9
3737 10
3838 11
3939 12
4040 13
4141 14
4242 15 - 2 -
4343 LRB-5836/1
4444 CMH:klm
4545 2023 - 2024 Legislature
4646 Whereas, Allied forces received additional support from the French Resistance;
4747 and
4848 Whereas, more than 9,000 Allied troops were killed or wounded during the first
4949 24 hours of the invasion; and
5050 Whereas, the Normandy landings were the beginning of the liberation of
5151 Western Europe from Axis control; and
5252 Whereas, the French capital of Paris was liberated from German control on
5353 August 25, 1944; now, therefore, be it
5454 Resolved by the assembly, the senate concurring, That the members of the
5555 Wisconsin Legislature solemnly recognize June 6, 2024, as the 80th anniversary of
5656 the D-Day invasion and pay tribute to the millions of American and other Allied
5757 troops who served honorably during the Second World War.
5858 (END)
5959 1
6060 2
6161 3
6262 4
6363 5
6464 6
6565 7
6666 8
6767 9
6868 10
6969 11
7070 12
7171 13