LRB-5836/1 CMH:klm 2023 - 2024 LEGISLATURE 2023 ASSEMBLY JOINT RESOLUTIO N 115 February 12, 2024 - Introduced by Representatives GUNDRUM, ARMSTRONG, BARE, BEHNKE, BINSFELD, CALLAHAN, DITTRICH, DONOVAN, DRAKE, DUCHOW, EDMING, GUSTAFSON, JACOBSON, KRUG, MAGNAFICI, MAXEY, MOORE OMOKUNDE, NOVAK, O'CONNOR, OHNSTAD, ORTIZ-VELEZ, PETRYK, RATCLIFF, RETTINGER, ROZAR, TITTL, SCHMIDT, SHANKLAND, SINICKI, SORTWELL, SPIROS, TUSLER and WITTKE, cosponsored by Senators TESTIN, BALLWEG, CARPENTER, COWLES, MARKLEIN, NASS, SPREITZER and WIRCH. Referred to Committee on Rules. ***AUTHORS SUBJECT TO CHANGE*** Relating to: commemorating the 80th anniversary of D-Day. Whereas, on September 1, 1939, Germany declared war on Poland and started the Second World War; and Whereas, France surrendered on June 25, 1940, and was occupied by the Axis countries of Germany and Italy; and Whereas, the United States entered the war following the Japanese attack at Pearl Harbor on December 7, 1941; and Whereas, at the Trident Conference in May 1943, American President Franklin D. Roosevelt and British Prime Minister Winston Churchill decided an Allied invasion of German-occupied France would take place in 1944; and Whereas, more than 150,000 soldiers and 190,000 naval personnel participated in airborne operations and the amphibious landings at beaches along the Normandy coastline code-named Omaha, Utah, Gold, Juno, and Sword; and Whereas, American, British, Canadian, Free French, and Free Polish divisions participated in the invasion, which commenced June 6, 1944; and 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 - 2 - LRB-5836/1 CMH:klm 2023 - 2024 Legislature Whereas, Allied forces received additional support from the French Resistance; and Whereas, more than 9,000 Allied troops were killed or wounded during the first 24 hours of the invasion; and Whereas, the Normandy landings were the beginning of the liberation of Western Europe from Axis control; and Whereas, the French capital of Paris was liberated from German control on August 25, 1944; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the assembly, the senate concurring, That the members of the Wisconsin Legislature solemnly recognize June 6, 2024, as the 80th anniversary of the D-Day invasion and pay tribute to the millions of American and other Allied troops who served honorably during the Second World War. (END) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13