House | 10/05/2023 | Not published. Enrolled Joint Resolution 6 | ||
House | 09/19/2023 | Deposited in the office of the Secretary of State on 9-19-2023 | ||
House | 09/15/2023 | Report correctly enrolled on 9-15-2023 | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Received from Senate concurred in | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Agard, Bradley, Cabral-Guevara, Felzkowski, Feyen, Hesselbein, Hutton, Jagler, James, Kapenga, Knodl, L. Johnson, Larson, LeMahieu, Pfaff, Quinn, Roys, Stafsholt, Stroebel, Taylor, Testin, Tomczyk, Wanggaard, Wimberger and Wirch of the Senate added as cosponsors | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Concurred in by unanimous rising vote | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Read | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from committee on Senate Organization and take up | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Read and referred to committee on Senate Organization | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Received from Assembly | ||
Senate | 09/14/2023 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Adopted | ||
House | 09/14/2023 | Rules suspended to withdraw from calendar and take up | ||
House | 09/12/2023 | Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 by Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Read and referred to Committee on Rules | ||
House | 05/12/2023 | Introduced |