Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Published 3-22-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2024
|
Report approved by the Governor on 3-21-2024. 2023 Wisconsin Act 152
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Presented to the Governor on 3-18-2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2024
|
Report correctly enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2024
|
Received from Assembly concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Representative Gustafson added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a third time and concurred in
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Rules suspended
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered immediately messaged
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Ordered to a third reading
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2024
|
Read a second time
|
|
|
House
|
01/23/2024
|
Made a special order of business at 10:07 AM on 1-25-2024 pursuant to Assembly Resolution 23
|
|
|
House
|
10/19/2023
|
Read first time and referred to committee on Rules
|
|
|
House
|
09/14/2023
|
Received from Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Read a third time and passed
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Rules suspended to give bill its third reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/14/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2023
|
Placed on calendar 9-14-2023 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Available for scheduling
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Report passage as amended recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2023
|
Report adoption of Senate Amendment 1 recommended by Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs, Ayes 5, Noes 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2023
|
Executive action taken
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2023
|
Representative O'Connor added as a cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2023
|
Senate Amendment 1 offered by Senator Marklein
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2023
|
Public hearing held
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Read first time and referred to Committee on Labor, Regulatory Reform, Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|