House | 04/15/2024 | Failed to concur in pursuant to Senate Joint Resolution 1 | ||
House | 02/20/2024 | Representative Emerson added as a cosponsor | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | Read first time and referred to committee on Rules | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | Received from Senate | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Ordered immediately messaged | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Read a third time and passed, Ayes 31, Noes 1 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Rules suspended to give bill its third reading | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Ordered to a third reading | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Read a second time | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Placed on calendar 2-13-2024 pursuant to Senate Rule 18(1) | ||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | Available for scheduling | ||
Senate | 12/11/2023 | Report passage recommended by Committee on Health, Ayes 6, Noes 0 | ||
Senate | 12/07/2023 | Executive action taken | ||
Senate | 10/16/2023 | Representative Ratcliff added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Senator Carpenter added as a coauthor | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Public hearing held | ||
Senate | 10/09/2023 | Representative Joers added as a cosponsor | ||
Senate | 10/09/2023 | Fiscal estimate received | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Read first time and referred to Committee on Health | ||
Senate | 09/08/2023 | Introduced |