Arizona 2022 Regular Session

Arizona House Bill HB2031 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022

Chaptered

Bill June 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis June 3, 2022
Analysis May 18, 2022
Analysis May 2, 2022
Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022